US HB2096 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-5)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows tax credits for (1) energy storage technologies, and (2) battery storage technology. The bill expands the tax credit for investments in energy property to include equipment that (1) receives, stores, and delivers energy using batteries, compressed air, pumped hydropower, hydrogen storage (including hydrolysis), thermal energy storage, regenerative fuel cells, flywheels, capacitors, superconducting magnets, or other technologies identified by the Internal Revenue Service; and (2) has a capacity of at least five kilowatt hours. The bill also expands the tax credit for residential energy efficient property to include expenditures for battery storage technology that (1) is installed on or in connection with a dwelling unit located in the United States and used as a residence by the taxpayer, and (2) has a capacity of at least three kilowatt hours.
Title
Energy Storage Tax Incentive and Deployment Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-04-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1142 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5409 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB7516 (Related) 2020-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
HB5409 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB7516 (Related) 2020-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Business investment and capital
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Income tax credits
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Taxation
Business investment and capital
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Income tax credits
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2096/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2096/BILLS-116hr2096ih.pdf |