US HB2181 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Safe Food for Seniors Act of 2013 - Amends titles XVIII (Medicare) and XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act, for a Medicare skilled nursing facility or a Medicaid nursing facility without a full-time qualified dietitian, to require its director of food services to be: (1) a Certified Dietary Manager meeting the requirements of the Certifying Board for Dietary Managers; (2) a Dietetic Technician, Registered meeting with the requirements published by the Commission on Dietetic Registration; or (3) an individual with equivalent military or academic qualifications.
Title
Safe Food for Seniors Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB473 (Related) 2013-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medicare
Nutrition and diet
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medicare
Nutrition and diet
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2181/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2181/BILLS-113hr2181ih.pdf |