US HB2226 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fentanyl Sanctions Act This bill establishes programs to address illicit opioid trafficking and imposes sanctions on foreign individuals and entities involved in such activities. The President shall impose sanctions on foreign individuals and entities identified as opioid traffickers or those that own, control, or supply opioid precursors. The sanctions include bans on (1) receiving loans, (2) foreign exchange transactions, (3) property transactions, and (4) certain investments that fall under U.S. jurisdiction. The President may waive sanctions on certain parties for national security and humanitarian concerns. The President shall report to Congress about the implementation of such sanctions and also on cooperative efforts with Mexico and China to combat illicit opioid trafficking. The bill establishes the Commission on Synthetic Opioid Trafficking, which shall develop a strategy to combat the flow of synthetic opioids into the United States. The commission shall report on various topics, including the scope of illicit trafficking in other countries and the deficiencies in other countries' regulation of pharmaceutical and chemical production. The Office of the Director of National Intelligence (ODNI) shall establish a program to assist in enforcement efforts and sanctions against illicit opioid traffickers, with a focus on illicit finance. ODNI shall periodically report to Congress about the intelligence community's counter-narcotics efforts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fentanyl Sanctions Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1044 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HB2483 (Related) 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-09-12 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB2500 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Received in the Senate.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback