US HB2483 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fentanyl Sanctions Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fentanyl Sanctions Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-05-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-02HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2226 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB1044 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-07-02 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback