US HB2333 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia National Guard Retention and College Access Act - Authorizes the commanding general of the District of Columbia National Guard to provide educational assistance to members of the District of Columbia National Guard who have satisfactorily completed their initial active duty service and agree to serve for a period of not less than six years. Requires such assistance to be used by members for expenses incurred in pursuing their first undergraduate, master's, vocational, or technical degree or certification at an approved institution of higher education.
Title
District of Columbia National Guard Retention and College Access Act
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-08 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. | |
2009-05-07 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1097) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3323 (Related) 2009-07-24 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1933)
HB3913 (Related) 2010-07-26 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management, the Federal Workforce, and the District of Columbia.
HB3913 (Related) 2010-07-26 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management, the Federal Workforce, and the District of Columbia.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
District of Columbia
Education programs funding
Higher education
National Guard and reserves
Student aid and college costs
Vocational education
District of Columbia
Education programs funding
Higher education
National Guard and reserves
Student aid and college costs
Vocational education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2333/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2333/BILLS-111hr2333ih.pdf |