US HB2405 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-9)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 262.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 262.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2025 and revises the National Sea Grant College Program, through which the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) supports university-based programs that focus on studying, conserving, and effectively using U.S. coastal resources. Among other things, the bill requires NOAA to award Dean John A. Knauss Marine Policy Fellowships. Currently, NOAA has discretion in awarding such fellowships. The fellowships support the placement of graduate students in fields related to ocean, coastal, and Great Lakes resources in positions with the executive and legislative branches. The bill reauthorizes through FY2025 grants for (1) university research on the biology, prevention, and control of aquatic nonnative species; (2) university research on oyster diseases, oyster restoration, and oyster-related human health risks; (3) university research on the biology, prevention, and forecasting of harmful algal blooms; and (4) fishery extension activities conducted by sea grant colleges or sea grant institutes to enhance existing core program funding. The bill authorizes grants for (1) priority issues identified in the National Sea Grant Program's strategic plan, and (2) university research on sustainable aquaculture techniques and technologies.
Title
National Sea Grant College Program Amendments Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 262. |
2019-12-05 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-323. |
2019-09-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 12. |
2019-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2019-05-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB910 (Related) 2020-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-221. (TXT | PDF)
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Agricultural research
Aquaculture
Aquatic ecology
Congressional committees
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Education programs funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Great Lakes
Higher education
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Seafood
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Student aid and college costs
Agricultural research
Aquaculture
Aquatic ecology
Congressional committees
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Education programs funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Great Lakes
Higher education
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Seafood
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Student aid and college costs