US HB2418 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the E-3 visa program to cover Irish nationals. The E-3 visa is a nonimmigrant visa currently only available to Australian nationals coming to the United States for employment in a specialty occupation.
Title
To add Ireland to the E-3 nonimmigrant visa program.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2877 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Received in the Senate.
SB3134 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3134 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2418/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2418/BILLS-116hr2418ih.pdf |