US HB2438 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-8)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 409.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Not Invisible Act of 2020 This bill increases the coordination of efforts to reduce violent crime within Indian lands and against Indians. Specifically, the Department of the Interior must designate an official within the Bureau of Indian Affairs to coordinate prevention efforts, grants, and programs related to missing Indians and the murder and human trafficking of Indians. In addition, Interior and the Department of Justice (DOJ) must (1) establish a joint commission on violent crime within Indian lands and against Indians, and (2) submit a written response to the recommendations developed by the joint commission. The joint commission must develop and make publicly available recommendations to Interior and DOJ on actions to combat violent crime against Indians and within Indian lands, including recommendations for identifying, reporting, and responding to instances of missing persons, murder, and human trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Not Invisible Act of 2020

Sponsors

Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]
Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 409.
2020-09-16HouseCommittee on Natural Resources discharged.
2020-09-16HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-509, Part I.
2020-03-11HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-03-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-03-10HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
2019-05-31HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-05-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-05-01HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-01HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB982 (Same As) 2020-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 116-166. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback