US HB2483 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-14 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 14 .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-14 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 14 .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Whistleblower Improvement Act of 2011 - Amends the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 and the Commodity Exchange Act to require a whistleblower employee, as a prerequisite to eligibility for a whistleblower award, to: (1) first report information relating to misconduct to his or her employer before reporting it to the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC), and (2) report such information to the SEC within 180 days after reporting it to the employer. Prohibits a whistleblower award to any whistleblower who fails to report the relevant information to his or her employer first, unless: (1) the employer lacks either a policy prohibiting retaliation for reporting potential misconduct or an internal reporting system allowing for anonymous reporting, or (2) the SEC determines that internal reporting was not a viable option. Prohibits a whistleblower award to any whistleblower who has legal or compliance responsibilities and a fiduciary or contractual obligation to investigate internal reports of misconduct or violations if the information learned by the whistleblower during the course of his or her duties was communicated with the reasonable expectation that such person would take appropriate steps to respond. Makes the whistleblower award discretionary instead of mandatory. Repeals the minimum award requirement. Prohibits an award to a whistleblower found civilly liable or determined by the SEC to have been complicit in misconduct related to the pertinent violation. Requires the SEC to notify the pertinent entity before commencing any enforcement action relating to information reported by a whistleblower, unless such notification would jeopardize investigative measures and impede the gathering of relevant facts. Directs the Comptroller General to study what impact, if any, the whistleblower incentives program has had upon shareholder value.
Title
Whistleblower Improvement Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] | Rep. John Campbell [R-CA] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Scott Garrett [R-NJ] |
Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-14 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 14 . |
2011-12-14 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-08-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises. |
2011-07-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management. |
2011-07-11 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2011-07-11 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2011-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2011-05-11 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Business ethics
Commodities markets
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Business ethics
Commodities markets
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2483/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2483/BILLS-112hr2483ih.pdf |