US HB2511 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defense Acquisition Streamlining and Transparency Act This bill directs the Department of Defense (DOD) to establish a program to procure commercial off-the-shelf products through online marketplaces to expedite procurement and ensure reasonable pricing. A contract may be made without full and open competition. DOD shall comply with commercially accepted standards of risk and materiality in performing an incurred cost audit. DOD shall emphasize sustainment factors: (1) early in a weapon system's development, and (2) in the development of capabilities requirements. A weapon system contract shall include clearly defined requirements for reliability and maintainability. DOD shall establish: (1) contract performance best practices, which shall include incentive fees and recovery options; and (2) an investment program for funding weapon system design changes. DOD shall negotiate the price of technical data before selecting a contractor for the development or production of a major weapon system. The bill establishes an Office of Intellectual Property within the Office of the Under Secretary of Defense for Acquisition and Sustainment. DOD shall ensure that: (1) sufficient data is collected and evaluated in support of a services contract, and (2) certain funding requirements are displayed separately for major defense acquisition programs. DOD shall evaluate its strategy for developing and expanding the use of tools designed to facilitate the cost effectiveness and efficiency of developmental testing. DOD shall: (1) implement a program to develop civil program managers for major defense acquisition programs, and (2) contract with an independent research entity to carry out a study of financial incentives for such managers. The DOD acquisition workforce demonstration project is extended through December 31, 2023. The defense business enterprise architecture shall include one or more common enterprise data structures to facilitate DOD-wide analysis.
Title
Defense Acquisition Streamlining and Transparency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 1003 to H.R. 2810 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Armed forces and national security
Budget process
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intellectual property
Licensing and registrations
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Armed forces and national security
Budget process
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intellectual property
Licensing and registrations
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation