US HB2559 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-22 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-22 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Help Our Homeless Veterans Act - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out a national media campaign targeted at veterans who are homeless or at risk of becoming homeless, with special emphasis on such veterans who are women.
Title
Help Our Homeless Veterans Act
Sponsors
Rep. Shelley Berkley [D-NV] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] | Rep. John Hall [D-NY] |
Rep. Deborah Halvorson [D-IL] | Rep. Phil Hare [D-IL] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. Glenn Nye [D-VA] | Rep. Glenn Nye [D-VA] | Rep. Ciro Rodriguez [D-TX] |
Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Harry Teague [D-NM] | Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] |
Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-22 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . | |
2009-10-22 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-10-01 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-05-22 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Government information and archives
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Government information and archives
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2559/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2559/BILLS-111hr2559ih.pdf |