US HB2559 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-49. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-49. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the "PFC Milton A. Lee Medal of Honor Memorial Highway" in the State of Texas. (Sec. 1) The segment of Interstate Route 10 between milepost 535 and milepost 545 at Kendall County, Texas, shall now be the "PFC Milton A. Lee Medal of Honor Memorial Highway."
Title
To designate the "PFC Milton A. Lee Medal of Honor Memorial Highway" in the State of Texas.
Sponsors
Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] |
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] |
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] |
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] |
Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] |
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] |
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 389 N: 0 NV: 44 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-07 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-49. (TXT | PDF) |
2015-08-07 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6425) |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2015-06-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-06-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 0 (Roll no. 365). (text: CR H4352) |
2015-06-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4361-4362) |
2015-06-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-06-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2559. |
2015-06-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4352-4353) |
2015-06-15 | House | Mr. Graves (MO) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2015-05-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2015-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Military personnel and dependents
Roads and highways
Texas
Transportation and public works
Military personnel and dependents
Roads and highways
Texas
Transportation and public works