US HB2561 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
POLICE Act of 2017 Protecting Officers of the Law In Civilian Establishments Act of 2017 This bill amends the federal criminal code to modify the restriction on possessing a firearm or other dangerous weapon in a federal facility. Specifically, the prohibition does not apply to the lawful carrying of agency-issued firearms and dangerous weapons by a uniformed law enforcement officer in certain publically accessible federal facilities.
Title
POLICE Act of 2017 Protecting Officers of the Law In Civilian Establishments Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] |
Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] |
Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] |
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-15 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations Discharged. |
2017-06-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-05-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Firearms and explosives
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Law enforcement officers
Firearms and explosives
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Law enforcement officers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2561/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2561/BILLS-115hr2561ih.pdf |