US HB2566 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to revise the Safer Choice Standard of the Safer Choice Program. Specifically, the EPA must identify the requirements that specified products (e.g., pots, pans, or cooking utensils) must meet in order to be labeled with a Safer Choice label, including a requirement that such products do not contain certain perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances, commonly referred to as PFAS. These substances are man-made and may have adverse human health effects. A variety of products contain the compounds, such as nonstick cookware or weatherproof clothing.
Title
To require the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to revise the Safer Choice Standard to provide for a Safer Choice label for pots, pans, and cooking utensils that do not contain PFAS, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-09-26 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB535 (Related) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HR779 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR779 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Consumer affairs
Environmental protection
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Marketing and advertising
Product safety and quality
Environmental protection
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Marketing and advertising
Product safety and quality
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2566/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2566/BILLS-116hr2566ih.pdf |