US HB2601 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 30-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
VICTOR Act of 2017 Veterans Increased Choice for Transplanted Organs and Recovery Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Veterans Access, Choice, and Accountability Act of 2014 to include among veterans eligible to receive hospital care and medical services through agreements with the Department of Defense, the Indian Health Service, federally-qualified health centers, or health care providers that participate in the Medicare program a veteran: who requires an organ or bone marrow transplant; and who has a medically compelling reason to travel outside the veteran's Organ Procurement and Transplantation Network region in which the veteran resides to receive a transplant at a VA medical facility, or who faces an unusual or excessive burden in receiving such transplant at a VA facility, such as geographical challenges, environmental factors, or a medical condition that affects the ability to travel.
Title
VICTOR Act of 2017 Veterans Increased Choice for Transplanted Organs and Recovery Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] |
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] |
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] |
Rep. David Young [R-IA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] |
Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-11-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8559) |
2017-11-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2601. |
2017-11-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8558-8560) |
2017-11-07 | House | Mr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 291. |
2017-11-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-395. |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-05-22 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4395) |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Health care coverage and access
Hospital care
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Veterans' medical care
Health care coverage and access
Hospital care
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Veterans' medical care