US HB2633 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit Enhancement Act of 2017 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the tax credit for employment-related expenses incurred for the care of a taxpayer's dependent, to: (1) increase to $120,000, the adjusted gross income threshold level above which such credit is incrementally reduced; (2) increase the dollar limit on the allowable amount of such credit; (3) allow an inflation adjustment to the adjusted gross income threshold and the maximum credit amounts, beginning after 2018; and (4) make such credit refundable.
Title
Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit Enhancement Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-05-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2238 (Related) 2017-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB470 (Same As) 2017-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1880 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1938 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB470 (Same As) 2017-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1880 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1938 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2633/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2633/BILLS-115hr2633ih.pdf |