US HB2648 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-29 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-29 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits a borrower to discharge in bankruptcy a nonprofit, government, or private student loan, or an obligation to repay an educational benefit, scholarship, or stipend.
Title
Student Borrower Bankruptcy Relief Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] |
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] |
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 5. |
2020-09-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-14 | House | Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Discharged. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB770 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB1414 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1414 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2648/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2648/BILLS-116hr2648ih.pdf |