US HB2681 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to submit to Congress a report on the availability of prosthetic items for women veterans from the Department of Veterans Affairs. This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to report on the availability of prosthetic items made for women veterans, including an assessment of the availability of such items at VA medical facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to submit to Congress a report on the availability of prosthetic items for women veterans from the Department of Veterans Affairs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-06-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-05-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-05-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB514 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
HB3224 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback