US HB2685 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Energy to provide technology grants to strengthen domestic mining education, and for other purposes.
Title
Mining Schools Act of 2023 Technology Grants to Strengthen Domestic Mining Education Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] |
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] |
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Harriet Hageman [R-WY] | Rep. Celeste Maloy [R-UT] |
Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ] | Rep. Brittany Pettersen [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-04-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB912 (Same As) 2023-12-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 292.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/2685/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr2685/BILLS-118hr2685ih.pdf |