US HB2708 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Indian Health Care Improvement Act Amendments of 2009 - Amends the Indian Health Care Improvement Act to revise requirements for health care programs and services for Indians, Indian tribes, tribal organizations, and urban Indian organizations. Replaces the Urban Health Programs Branch with a Division of Urban Indian Health. Authorizes grants to urban Indian organizations for health information technology, telemedicine services development, and related infrastructure. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services, acting through the Indian Health Service, to provide programs of comprehensive behavioral health, prevention, and treatment. Excludes from gross income: (1) services or benefits provided or purchased by the Service; and (2) services or benefits provided by a tribe or tribal organization, directly or through insurance. Declares that these provisions are not intended as an inference to the tax treatment of governmental benefits provided by tribes to Indians. Reauthorizes the Indian Health Care Improvement Act. Amends the Indian Self-Determination and Education Assistance Act to direct the Secretary to establish the Native American Health and Wellness Foundation. Expands coverage for qualified Indians in the State Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP, formerly known as SCHIP) under title XXI of the Social Security Act (SSA), as well as under Medicare (SSA title XVIII) and Medicaid (SSA title XIX). Authorizes related payments to Indian Health Programs operating in the state.
Title
Indian Health Care Improvement Act Amendments of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Baca [D-CA] | Rep. Mary Bono Mack [R-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Dan Boren [D-OK] |
Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Phil Hare [D-IL] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Rep. Jay Inslee [D-WA] | Rep. Steve Kagen [D-WI] |
Rep. Dale Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Jim Matheson [D-UT] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. George Miller [D-CA] |
Rep. Walter Minnick [D-ID] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Nick Rahall [D-WV] | Rep. Laura Richardson [D-CA] |
Rep. John Salazar [D-CO] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Mark Schauer [D-MI] |
Rep. Heath Shuler [D-NC] | Rep. Harry Teague [D-NM] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-20 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-06-25 | Committee Hearings Held. | |
2009-06-08 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to House Natural Resources | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Buy American requirements
Cancer
Child health
Comprehensive health care
Computers and information technology
Crime prevention
Department of the Interior
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Environmental health
Executive agency funding and structure
Government investigations
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Income tax exclusion
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Land transfers
Licensing and registrations
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medical research
Medicare
Mental health
Minority health
Native Americans
Nursing
Public contracts and procurement
Sex offenses
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Women's health
Cancer
Child health
Comprehensive health care
Computers and information technology
Crime prevention
Department of the Interior
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Environmental health
Executive agency funding and structure
Government investigations
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Income tax exclusion
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Land transfers
Licensing and registrations
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medical research
Medicare
Mental health
Minority health
Native Americans
Nursing
Public contracts and procurement
Sex offenses
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2708/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2708/BILLS-111hr2708ih.pdf |