US HB2726 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 185-114)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-282.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 185-114)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-282.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Apollo 11 50th Anniversary Commemorative Coin Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue gold, silver, half-dollar clad, and proof silver coins in recognition and celebration of the 50th anniversary of the first manned landing on the moon. (Sec. 5) Treasury may issue coins minted under this bill for only a one-year period, beginning January 1, 2019. (Sec. 7) All sales of coins minted under this bill shall include a surcharge of $35 per gold coin, $10 per silver coin, $5 per half-dollar clad coin, and $50 per proof silver coin. All of the surcharges received from the sale of such coins shall be paid as follows: one-half to the Smithsonian Institution's National Air and Space Museum's "Destination Moon" exhibit; one-quarter to the Astronauts Memorial Foundation; and one-quarter to the Astronaut Scholarship Foundation, to aid its missions by providing college scholarships for the very best and brightest students pursuing degrees in science, technology, engineering, or mathematics (STEM). There may not be any surcharge if issuance of the coin would exceed the annual commemorative coin program issuance limitation. (Sec. 8) Treasury shall ensure that: minting and issuing such coins will not result in any net cost to the federal government; and no funds, including surcharges, will be disbursed to any recipient designated in section 7 until the total cost of designing and issuing all authorized coins is recovered.
Title
Apollo 11 50th Anniversary Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-282. |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7108) |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2016-12-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7149-7150) |
2016-12-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2726. |
2016-12-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7149-7152) |
2016-12-05 | House | Mr. Posey moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-06-10 | House | Referred to House Budget |
2015-06-10 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2015-06-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-06-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2957 (Related) 2016-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Higher education
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Science and engineering education
Smithsonian Institution
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Space flight and exploration
Student aid and college costs
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Higher education
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Science and engineering education
Smithsonian Institution
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Space flight and exploration
Student aid and college costs