US HB277 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

ASCEND Act of 2019 Access to Sufficient Capital for Everyone in Natural Disaster areas Act of 2019 This bill makes permanent the increased threshold limits for the minimum major-disaster loan amount for which the Small Business Administration may require collateral.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ASCEND Act of 2019 Access to Sufficient Capital for Everyone in Natural Disaster areas Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
2019-07-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-15HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5805)
2019-07-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 277.
2019-07-15HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5805-5806)
2019-07-15HouseMr. Delgado moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-06-13HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 84.
2019-06-13HouseReported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-115.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback