US HB2770 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Nonprofit Research and Education Corporations Enhancement Act of 2009 - (Sec. 2) Amends federal provisions concerning the establishment at Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) medical facilities of nonprofit research and education corporations (NRECs) to allow an NREC to facilitate the conduct of research or education, or both, at more than one VA medical center. States that such an NREC shall be known as a multi-medical center research corporation (MCRC). Allows an NREC to act as a MCRC if: (1) the NREC board of directors approve a resolution permitting that NREC to act as a MCRC; and (2) the Secretary of Veterans Affairs approves the resolution. Requires each NREC and MCRC (corporation) to be established in accordance with the nonprofit corporation laws of the state in which the VA medical center which it supports is located. States that neither such corporation shall be considered to be owned by, or an agent or instrumentality of, the United States. (Sec. 3) Restates the purposes of the corporations, including with respect to their role in: (1) providing a flexible funding mechanism; and (2) residencies or similar programs. (Sec. 4) Modifies the composition of corporation boards of directors. Revises requirements concerning non-VA members of boards of directors of NRECs and MCRCs to: (1) state a minimum number who are not officers or employees of the federal government; and (2) expand the required areas of experience or expertise. Allows a corporation executive director to be an employee of the VA. Removes financial relationship restrictions from conflict of interest standards applicable to directors. (Sec. 5) Increases authorized corporate powers of the corporations to include entering into contracts and setting fees for education and training facilitated through a corporation. (Sec. 7) Revises annual report procedures to modify the thresholds for the obtaining of audits and require submission of an Internal Revenue Service return form applicable to organizations exempt from income tax. Revises conflict of interest policies applicable to directors, officers, and employees of a corporation to apply the policy adopted by the corporation (under current law, they are subject to federal laws and regulations applicable to federal employees). Revises requirements for a report to Congress to increase the threshold for providing information identifying payees of the corporation.
Title
Veterans Nonprofit Research and Education Corporations Enhancement Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] | Rep. Steve Buyer [R-IN] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] |
Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-28 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. | |
2009-07-27 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-07-27 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8820-8821) | |
2009-07-27 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2770. | |
2009-07-27 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8819-8822) | |
2009-07-27 | Mr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-07-23 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 123. | |
2009-07-23 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-225. | |
2009-07-15 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. | |
2009-07-15 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-07-09 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . | |
2009-07-09 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-06-18 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-06-12 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-06-09 | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. | |
2009-06-09 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1359) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2722 (Same As) 2009-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB252 (Related) 2009-07-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 128.
SB252 (Related) 2009-07-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 128.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Health facilities and institutions
Medical education
Medical research
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Health facilities and institutions
Medical education
Medical research
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Veterans' medical care