US HB2798 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 241.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 241.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To make reforms to the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, and for other purposes.
Title
CFPB Transparency and Accountability Reform Act CFPB Whistleblower Incentives and Protection Act Making the CFPB Accountable to Small Businesses Act of 2023 Transparency in CFPB Cost-Benefit Analysis Act CFPB Dual Mandate and Economic Analysis Act CFPB–IG Reform Act of 2023 Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection-Inspector General Reform Act of 2023 TABS Act of 2023 Taking Account of Bureaucrats’ Spending Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Erin Houchin [R-IN] | Rep. Wesley Hunt [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 241. |
2023-12-04 | House | Committee on Small Business discharged. |
2023-12-04 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2023-12-04 | House | Committee on Oversight and Accountability discharged. |
2023-12-04 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 118-297, Part I. |
2023-04-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 23. |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-04-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Accountability, the Judiciary, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-04-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1313 (Related) 2023-03-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB1410 (Related) 2023-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB1411 (Related) 2023-03-07 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1749 (Related) 2023-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2465 (Related) 2023-04-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB2489 (Related) 2023-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB2490 (Related) 2023-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1124 (Related) 2023-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1362 (Related) 2023-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB1410 (Related) 2023-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB1411 (Related) 2023-03-07 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1749 (Related) 2023-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2465 (Related) 2023-04-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB2489 (Related) 2023-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB2490 (Related) 2023-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1124 (Related) 2023-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1362 (Related) 2023-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.