US HB2867 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications, Technology, and the Internet.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications, Technology, and the Internet.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Digital TV Transition Fairness Act - Requires the Department of Commerce to implement and administer a program to obtain coupons that can be applied toward: (1) the cost to install a digital-to-analog converter box; (2) the purchase and installation of an indoor or outdoor antenna, or both if needed, to facilitate the reception and display of signals of channels broadcast in digital television service; and (3) the cost to install, or the cost of any other equipment needed to receive and display, basic broadcast television service. Sets forth consumer and product eligibility criteria. Provides for a website and telephone hotline to provide relevant information to assist consumers that have degraded or lost signals or channels as a result of the full power transition from analog to digital television that is to occur on February 17, 2009. Requires the Assistant Secretary of Commerce for Communications and Information to develop anti-fraud measures and procedures to ensure that only eligible households and individuals receive a coupon. Requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to promulgate rules requiring that each multichannel video programming distributor providing broadcast television for a local market provide to eligible consumers in that local market access to basic broadcast television service. Requires the FCC to develop anti-fraud measures and procedures to ensure that only eligible consumers are provided access to basic broadcast television service. Directs the FCC to carry out an education and outreach campaign to inform and educate consumers on the availability, benefits, and advantages of the programs and requirements established under this Act.
Title
Digital TV Transition Fairness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] | Rep. Phil Hare [D-IL] | Rep. Joe Sestak [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-16 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications, Technology, and the Internet. | |
2009-06-15 | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB25 (Same As) 2009-01-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
Television and film
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
Television and film
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2867/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2867/BILLS-111hr2867ih.pdf |