US HB2951 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of the Treasury to modify Treasury Regulations relating to insurance-dedicated exchange-traded funds.
Title
To direct the Secretary of the Treasury to modify Treasury Regulations relating to insurance-dedicated exchange-traded funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2954 (Related) 2022-03-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1770 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4808 (Related) 2022-09-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 480.
SB1770 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4808 (Related) 2022-09-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 480.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2951/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2951/BILLS-117hr2951ih.pdf |