US HB3000 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure that State and local law enforcement may cooperate with Federal officials to protect our communities from violent criminals and suspected terrorists who are illegally present in the United States.
Title
Stop Dangerous Sanctuary Cities Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] |
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] |
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1644 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1885 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB1885 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Citizenship and naturalization
Detention of persons
Economic development
Housing and community development funding
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Citizenship and naturalization
Detention of persons
Economic development
Housing and community development funding
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local finance
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3000/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3000/BILLS-116hr3000ih.pdf |