US HB3046 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a military department to retain in an active status a reserve chaplain or reserve officer in a medical specialty beyond the date that such individual turns 68 years old, with the consent of the officer, if the retention is necessary.
Title
To amend title 10, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of a military department to retain a reserve chaplain or reserve officer in a medical specialty beyond the date that such individual turns 68 years old.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-05-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-05-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3034 (Related) 2019-05-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Religion
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Religion
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3046/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3046/BILLS-116hr3046ih.pdf |