US HB3051 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the tax deduction for energy efficient commercial buildings through December 31, 2019. (Under current law, the deduction expired after December 31, 2017.)
Title
CLEANER Buildings Act Commercial, Low Emissions And Net Energy Reduction Buildings Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-05-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB617 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 28.
HB5160 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3301 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 300.
HB5160 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3301 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 300.
Subjects
Building construction
Energy efficiency and conservation
Income tax deductions
Lighting, heating, cooling
Taxation
Energy efficiency and conservation
Income tax deductions
Lighting, heating, cooling
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3051/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3051/BILLS-116hr3051ih.pdf |