US HB3093 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Investor Clarity and Bank Parity Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Bank Holding Company Act of 1956 to permit a hedge fund or private-equity fund to share the same name, or a variation of the same name, with a banking entity that is an investment adviser to the hedge fund or private-equity fund, if: the investment adviser is not, and does not share the same name with, an insured depository institution, a company that controls an insured depository institution, or a company treated as a bank holding company for purposes of specified provisions of law relating to nonbanking activities of foreign banks; and the name does not contain the word "bank."
Title
Investor Clarity and Bank Parity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2017-12-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9773) |
2017-12-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3093. |
2017-12-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9773) |
2017-12-11 | House | Mr. Luetkemeyer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-11-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 316. |
2017-11-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-426. |
2017-11-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-06-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Securities
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Securities