US HB31 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prevention of Executive Amnesty Act of 2015 This bill prohibits funds appropriated or otherwise made available, including any otherwise available to the Secretary of Homeland Security for any fiscal year from being used to implement or enforce specified immigration-related policies in: the memoranda issued by the Secretary on November 20, 2014, which includes prosecutorial discretion regarding individuals who came to the United States as children and regarding certain individuals who are the parents of U.S. citizens or permanent residents, and expansion of the provisional waiver program; the memoranda issued by the President on November 21, 2014, which includes modernizing and streamlining the U.S. immigrant visa system for the 21st century; and any substantially similar memorandum issued after November 21, 2014.
Title
Prevention of Executive Amnesty Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Renee Ellmers [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to House Homeland Security |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB155 (Related) 2015-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB206 (Related) 2015-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB206 (Related) 2015-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Subjects
Appropriations
Arizona
Border security and unlawful immigration
California
Citizenship and naturalization
Congressional-executive branch relations
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign labor
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Homeland security
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Law enforcement administration and funding
Military personnel and dependents
New Mexico
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Texas
Visas and passports
Arizona
Border security and unlawful immigration
California
Citizenship and naturalization
Congressional-executive branch relations
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign labor
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Homeland security
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Law enforcement administration and funding
Military personnel and dependents
New Mexico
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Texas
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/31/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr31/BILLS-114hr31ih.pdf |