US HB3107 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of the Interior to establish the Federal Interagency Council on Outdoor Recreation.
Title
Improving Outdoor Recreation Coordination Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-09-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-06-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry. |
2023-05-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-05-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/3107/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr3107/BILLS-118hr3107ih.pdf |