US HB3121 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
All-American Flag Act (Sec. 2) This bill prohibits agencies from using funds to procure a U.S. flag unless such flag has been 100% manufactured in the United States from materials that have been grown or 100% U.S. produced or manufactured. This prohibition does not apply if an agency determines that satisfactory quality and sufficient quantity of U.S. flags cannot be procured as needed at U.S. market prices. Nor shall such prohibition apply to procurements: by vessels in foreign waters; for resale purposes in any military commissary, military exchange, or non-appropriated fund instrumentality operated by an agency; or for amounts less than the simplified acquisition threshold. The President: (1) may waive the prohibition upon determining that a waiver is necessary to comply with a trade agreement, and (2) shall publish a notice in the Federal Register within 30 days of granting a waiver.
Title
All-American Flag Act
Sponsors
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] |
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] |
Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9716-9717) |
2018-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3121. |
2018-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9716-9717) |
2018-11-29 | House | Mr. Comer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 811. |
2018-11-27 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-1044. |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Buy American requirements
Government operations and politics
National symbols
Public contracts and procurement
Government operations and politics
National symbols
Public contracts and procurement