US HB315 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Became Public Law No: 115-320.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Became Public Law No: 115-320.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Improving Access to Maternity Care Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Health Resources and Services Administration (HRSA) to identify maternity care health professional target areas, which are areas within health professional shortage areas that have a shortage of maternity care health professionals, for purposes of assigning maternity care health professionals to those areas. HRSA must collect and publish data comparing the availability of and need for maternity care health services in health professional shortage areas and areas within those areas.
Title
Improving Access to Maternity Care Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. David Young [R-IA] |
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-09 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 24 (Y: 405 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-320. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7372) |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 696. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2017-01-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-01-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 0 (Roll no. 24). (text: CR H203) |
2017-01-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H217-218) |
2017-01-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-01-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 315. |
2017-01-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H203-204) |
2017-01-09 | House | Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB783 (Same As) 2017-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Child health
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Medical education
Sex and reproductive health
Student aid and college costs
Women's health
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Medical education
Sex and reproductive health
Student aid and college costs
Women's health