US HB3154 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Inspector General Access Act of 2017 This bill amends the Inspector General Act of 1978 to eliminate a provision of such Act that requires referral of allegations of misconduct involving Department of Justice (DOJ) attorneys, investigators, or law enforcement personnel to the DOJ Office of Professional Responsibility (thus allowing the DOJ Inspector General to investigate such allegations).
Title
Inspector General Access Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9717) |
2018-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3154. |
2018-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9717-9720) |
2018-11-29 | House | Mr. Comer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 812. |
2018-11-27 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-1045. |
2018-09-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1880 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3003 (Related) 2018-06-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3003 (Related) 2018-06-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Justice
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Department of Justice
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations