US HB3193 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-17 - Referred for a period ending not later than October 17, 2011, (or for a later time if the Chairman so designates) to the Subcommittee on Human Resources, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the subcommittee concerned.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-17 - Referred for a period ending not later than October 17, 2011, (or for a later time if the Chairman so designates) to the Subcommittee on Human Resources, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the subcommittee concerned.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Welfare Integrity Act of 2011 - Amends part A (Temporary Assistance for Needy Families) (TANF) of title IV of the Social Security Act to require state TANF programs to operate a program to conduct random testing of TANF applicants and recipients for illegal drug use. Requires state TANF programs to deny assistance to individuals who test positive for illegal drugs and individuals convicted of drug-related crimes. Prescribes an administrative penalty for failure to implement illegal drug use testing.
Title
Welfare Integrity Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Fincher [R-TN] | Rep. Brian Bilbray [R-CA] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] |
Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-17 | House | Referred for a period ending not later than October 17, 2011, (or for a later time if the Chairman so designates) to the Subcommittee on Human Resources, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the subcommittee concerned. |
2011-10-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2011-10-13 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1864-1865) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1769 (Related) 2011-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Subjects
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3193/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3193/BILLS-112hr3193ih.pdf |