US HB3213 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Company Job Growth and Regulatory Relief Act of 2011 - Amends the Sarbanes-Oxley Act of 2002 to revise the small issuer exemption from the requirement that each registered public accounting firm that prepares or issues the audit report for a securities issuer attest to, and report on, the issuer's management assessment of the effectiveness of its internal control structure and procedures for financial reporting. Specifies that this requirement shall not apply to an issuer that has a total public float for the relevant reporting period of less than $350 million. Prohibits this Act from being construed to relieve or exempt an issuer from the internal control reporting and assessment requirements of the Sarbanes-Oxley Act of 2002, or from its requirement that officers of the issuer certify certain annual and quarterly reports.
Title
Small Company Job Growth and Regulatory Relief Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Fincher [R-TN] | Rep. Francisco Canseco [R-TX] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Robert Dold [R-IL] |
Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Scott Garrett [R-NJ] | Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] |
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Timothy Johnson [R-IL] |
Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] |
Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] | Rep. Benjamin Quayle [R-AZ] | Rep. Scott Rigell [R-VA] |
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises. |
2011-10-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2011-10-14 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1878) |
2011-10-05 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held and Forwarded to Full Committee by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Introduction and Referral Revised discussion draft, as amended, ordered favorably reported to the full committee by the subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises. |
2011-09-21 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3655 (Related) 2012-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Corporate finance and management
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Securities
Small business
Corporate finance and management
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Securities
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3213/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3213/BILLS-112hr3213ih.pdf |