US HB3339 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Standard Data and Technology Advancement Act or Standard DATA Act - Amends part A of title XI of the Social Security Act to direct the head of the department or agency responsible for administering certain human services programs to designate, by rule, nonproprietary and interoperable standard data elements for any category of information required to be reported.
Title
Standard DATA Act
Sponsors
Rep. Geoff Davis [R-KY] | Rep. Rick Berg [R-ND] | Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] |
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Wally Herger [R-CA] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] |
Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] |
Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Tom Price [R-GA] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] |
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Paul Ryan [R-WI] |
Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources. |
2011-11-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-11-03 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-11-03 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-11-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2011-11-03 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1992-1993) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1745 (Related) 2011-05-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 48.
HB2790 (Related) 2011-08-05 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1504)
HB2883 (Related) 2011-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 112-34.
SB904 (Related) 2011-05-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1542 (Related) 2011-09-20 - Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
HB3659 (Related) 2011-12-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4282 (Related) 2012-06-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6682 (Related) 2012-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2790 (Related) 2011-08-05 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1504)
HB2883 (Related) 2011-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 112-34.
SB904 (Related) 2011-05-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1542 (Related) 2011-09-20 - Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
HB3659 (Related) 2011-12-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4282 (Related) 2012-06-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6682 (Related) 2012-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Computers and information technology
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Labor
Government information and archives
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
Unemployment
Computers and information technology
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Labor
Government information and archives
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
Unemployment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3339/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3339/BILLS-112hr3339ih.pdf |