US HB3659 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Welfare Integrity and Data Improvement Act - Amends part A (Temporary Assistance for Needy Families) (TANF) of SSA title IV to extend the TANF program through FY2012. Directs the Secretary of HHS to designate standard data elements for any category of information required to be reported under TANF. Requires states to maintain policies and practices necessary to prevent the use of state TANF assistance in any transaction in any: (1) liquor store; (2) casino, gambling casino, or gaming establishment; or (3) retail establishment which provides adult-oriented entertainment in which performers disrobe or perform in an unclothed state for entertainment. Prescribes an administrative penalty for states which failure to enforce such requirement.
Title
Welfare Integrity and Data Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Geoff Davis [R-KY] |
Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2011-12-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-12-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8984-8985) |
2011-12-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3659. |
2011-12-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8984-8990) |
2011-12-15 | House | Mr. Paulsen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2011-12-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3339 (Related) 2011-11-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
HB3567 (Related) 2012-02-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3630 (Related) 2012-02-22 - Became Public Law No: 112-96.
SB943 (Related) 2011-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3567 (Related) 2012-02-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3630 (Related) 2012-02-22 - Became Public Law No: 112-96.
SB943 (Related) 2011-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Alcoholic beverages
Gambling
Government information and archives
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
State and local government operations
Gambling
Government information and archives
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
State and local government operations