US HB3350 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 161-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Keep Your Health Plan Act of 2013 - Permits a health insurance issuer that has in effect health insurance coverage in the individual market as of January 1, 2013, to continue offering such coverage for sale during 2014 outside of a health care exchange established under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. Treats such coverage as a grandfathered health plan for purposes of an individual meeting the requirement to maintain minimum essential health coverage.
Title
Keep Your Health Plan Act of 2013
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-15 - House - On Passage (Y: 261 N: 157 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-15 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 187 N: 230 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-11-15 - House - On Motion to Table the Appeal of the Ruling of the Chair (Y: 229 N: 191 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-15 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 187 N: 230 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-11-15 - House - On Motion to Table the Appeal of the Ruling of the Chair (Y: 229 N: 191 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2013-11-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-11-15 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 261 - 157 (Roll no. 587). (text: CR H7128) |
2013-11-15 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 187 - 230 (Roll no. 586). (consideration: CR H7143-7144) |
2013-11-15 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H7143) |
2013-11-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Andrews motion to recommit with instructions, pending the reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to give insurance companies the option to continue offering non-Affordable Care Act compliant plans through 2014 to current enrollees only, as long as those plans were in effect as of October 1, 2013. The motion also requires insurance companies to notify consumers of the differences between these extended plans and the options, credits, and subsidies available through the Affordable Care Acts exchanges, as well as instructions on how to receive them. Subsequently, the reservation of a point of order was withdrawn. |
2013-11-15 | House | Mr. Andrews moved to recommit with instructions to Energy and Commerce. (consideration: CR H7142-7144; text: CR H7142-7143) |
2013-11-15 | House | On motion to table the motion to appeal the ruling of the chair Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 229 - 191 (Roll no. 585). |
2013-11-15 | House | Mr. Upton moved to table the motion to appeal the ruling of the chair (consideration: CR H7142) |
2013-11-15 | House | Mr. Andrews appealed the ruling of the chair. The question was then put on sustaining the ruling of the chair. |
2013-11-15 | House | Point of order sustained against the motion to recommit with instructions. |
2013-11-15 | House | Mr. Upton raised a point of order against the motion to recommit with instructions. Mr. Upton stated that the amendment was not germane to the underlying bill. Sustained by the Chair. |
2013-11-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Andrews motion to recommit with instructions, pending the reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to replace the underlying bill with an entire new text. |
2013-11-15 | House | Mr. Andrews moved to recommit with instructions to Energy and Commerce. (consideration: CR H7139-7142; text: CR H7139-7140) |
2013-11-15 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H7139) |
2013-11-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3350. |
2013-11-15 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3350 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2013-11-15 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 413. (consideration: CR H7128-7145) |
2013-11-15 | House | Rule H. Res. 413 passed House. |
2013-11-14 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 413 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3350 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2013-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-10-28 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-10-28 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-10-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HR413 (Related) 2013-11-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3522 (Related) 2014-09-15 - Received in the Senate.
HB5453 (Related) 2014-09-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2808 (Related) 2014-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3522 (Related) 2014-09-15 - Received in the Senate.
HB5453 (Related) 2014-09-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2808 (Related) 2014-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.