US HB5453 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits a health insurance issuer that has in effect health insurance coverage in the group market on any date during 2013 to continue offering such coverage for sale through 2016 outside of a health care exchange established under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. Treats such coverage as a grandfathered health plan for purposes of an individual meeting the requirement to maintain minimum essential health coverage.
Title
To authorize health insurance issuers to continue to offer for sale current group health insurance coverage in satisfaction of the minimum essential health insurance coverage requirement, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Braley [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-09-11 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2014-09-11 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2014-09-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3350 (Related) 2013-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB3522 (Related) 2014-09-15 - Received in the Senate.
SB2808 (Related) 2014-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3522 (Related) 2014-09-15 - Received in the Senate.
SB2808 (Related) 2014-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5453/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5453/BILLS-113hr5453ih.pdf |