US HB3414 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-12)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 573.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 573.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the number of residency positions eligible for graduate medical education payments under Medicare for hospitals that have addiction or pain medicine programs, with an aggregate increase of 1,000 positions over a five-year period.
Title
Opioid Workforce Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 573. |
2020-12-24 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2020-12-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-690, Part I. |
2019-06-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 12. |
2019-06-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2892 (Same As) 2019-11-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Health
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Hospital care
Medical education
Medicare
Mental health
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Health
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Hospital care
Medical education
Medicare
Mental health