US HB3429 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HEARTS and Rural Relief Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEARTS and Rural Relief Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
2019-06-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2019-06-24HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-24HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-24HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-24HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2293 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2371 (Related) 2019-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3416 (Same As) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3431 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB3433 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback