US HB3444 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-17 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-17 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pinnacles National Park Act - Establishes Pinnacles National Park in California to: (1) preserve and interpret for the benefit of future generations the chaparral, grasslands, blue oak woodlands, and majestic valley oak savanna ecosystems of the park's area, the areas's geomorphology, riparian watersheds, unique flora and fauna, and the ancestral and cultural history of native Americans, settlers and explorers; and (2) interpret the recovery program for the California Condor and the international significance of that program. Abolishes Pinnacles National Monument and includes the lands and interests therein in Pinnacles National Park. Redesignates the Pinnacles Wilderness as the Hain Wilderness. Designates specified lands comprising approximately 2,905 acres as wilderness and as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System. Deems such lands as being part of the Hain Wilderness.
Title
Pinnacles National Park Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-17 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-08-07 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-07-31 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3744 (Related) 2010-09-29 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Forests. Hearings held.
Subjects
Birds
California
Endangered and threatened species
Forests
Historical and cultural resources
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
California
Endangered and threatened species
Forests
Historical and cultural resources
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3444/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3444/BILLS-111hr3444ih.pdf |