US HB3508 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Passed on October 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Passed on October 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 39 West Main Street, in Honeoye Falls, New York, as the "CW4 Christian J. Koch Memorial Post Office".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 39 West Main Street, in Honeoye Falls, New York, as the "CW4 Christian J. Koch Memorial Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Jacobs [R-NY] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] |
Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] |
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 408 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-196. |
2022-10-11 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-10-04 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4876; text: CR S4876) |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 472. |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report. |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-05-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-05-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 3, 2 Present (Roll no. 177). (text: 05/10/2022 CR H4790) |
2022-05-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4899-4900) |
2022-05-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-05-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3508. |
2022-05-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4790-4791) |
2022-05-10 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-12-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-12-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |