US HB3541 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 237.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 237.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Commerce to establish a coastal climate change adaptation preparedness and response program to (1) assist coastal states with voluntarily developing coastal climate change adaptation plans, and (2) provide financial and technical assistance and training for coastal states to implement the adaptation plans.
Title
Coastal State Climate Preparedness Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 237. |
2019-11-15 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-294. |
2019-09-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 15. |
2019-09-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-25 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2019-07-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Great Lakes
Lakes and rivers
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Natural disasters
Seashores and lakeshores
Travel and tourism
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Great Lakes
Lakes and rivers
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Natural disasters
Seashores and lakeshores
Travel and tourism
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection