US HB3559 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting ColoRectal Examination and Education Now (SCREEN) Act of 2009 - Declares the sense of Congress that colorectal cancer screening tests and the provisions of this Act should be included as part of any basic benefit package in any legislation that may be enacted to provide health insurance coverage, public or private, to persons under age 65. Authorizes the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to make grants to states and Indian tribes for colorectal health programs. Directs the Secretary to establish a program to notify all beneficiaries annually about coverage of colorectal cancer screening tests under title XVII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act (SSA). Amends SSA title XIX (Medicaid), as amended by the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009, to require any state Medicaid plan that includes colorectal cancer screening tests to provide for a program to notify individuals at risk for colon cancer, including high-risk minorities, who are over an appropriate age, of the availability of medical assistance for colorectal cancer screening tests. Amends SSA title XVIII (Medicare) to eliminate coinsurance for colorectal cancer screening tests. Prescribes annual reporting requirements under the Medicare Advantage program with regard to colorectal cancer screening tests. Directs the Secretary to: (1) establish a national minimum standard for basic knowledge, training, continuing education, and documentation for suppliers who furnish colorectal cancer screening tests; (2) determine age-based goal rates for such tests; and (3) establish an upward preventive service payment modifier for qualifying tests furnished on or after January 1, 2010, which reflects the Secretary's annual determination of the appropriate amount of additional payment sufficient to increase the rate of colorectal cancer screening tests. Extends Medicare coverage to an office visit or consultation prior to a qualifying screening colonoscopy.
Title
Supporting ColoRectal Examination and Education Now (SCREEN) Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Shelley Berkley [D-NV] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Steven Rothman [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-15 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-09-14 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2009-09-14 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-09-14 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. | |
2009-09-14 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2256-2257) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1511 (Related) 2009-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Cancer
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medicaid
Medical education
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Minority health
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medicaid
Medical education
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Minority health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3559/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3559/BILLS-111hr3559ih.pdf |