US HB3567 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements related to the acquisition and disposal of certain rare earth materials, such as those that contain scandium. The Department of Defense must establish guidance for the acquisition of items containing rare earth materials and establish a secure supply chain from appropriate sources. The bill requires the disposal of 3 million pounds of tungsten ores and concentrates stored in the National Defense Stockpile. The bill also authorizes the acquisition of specified materials determined to be strategically and critically required to meet the defense, industrial, and essential civilian needs of the United States. In addition, the bill expands the prohibition on the exchange of sensitive materials with non-allied foreign nations to include additional materials.
Title
Securing Americas Rare Earths Supply Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Materials
Metals
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Strategic materials and reserves
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Materials
Metals
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Strategic materials and reserves
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3567/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3567/BILLS-116hr3567ih.pdf |