US HB3620 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 610.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 610.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Delaware Water Gap National Recreation Area Improvement Act to provide access to certain vehicles serving residents of municipalities adjacent to the Delaware Water Gap National Recreation Area, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the Delaware Water Gap National Recreation Area Improvement Act with respect to the prohibition against the use of Highway 209, a federally owned road within the boundaries of the Delaware Water Gap National Recreation Area in Pennsylvania, by certain commercial vehicles except as they serve businesses located within or in the vicinity of the Recreation Area. The local business use exception to the prohibition is revised to permit, until September 30, 2020, the use of commercial vehicles with four or fewer axles that are: (1) owned and operated by a business located in the Recreation Area or one or more adjacent municipalities, or (2) necessary to provide services to businesses or persons located in the Recreation Area or one or more such municipalities. The adjacent municipalities referred to are Delaware Township, Dingman Township, Lehman Township, Matamoras Borough, Middle Smithfield Township, Milford Borough, Milford Township, Smithfield Township, and Westfall Township in Pennsylvania. The Department of the Interior shall establish a fee and permit program for the use of Highway 209 by commercial vehicles, including an annual fee of up to $200 per vehicle. All fees received shall be set aside in a special account and be available for the administration and enforcement of the program, including registering vehicles, issuing permits and vehicle identification stickers, and personnel costs. The following vehicles may use Highway 209 without a fee or permit requirement: local school buses; fire, ambulance, and other safety and emergency vehicles; and commercial vehicles along specified segments of the highway.
Title
To amend the Delaware Water Gap National Recreation Area Improvement Act to provide access to certain vehicles serving residents of municipalities adjacent to the Delaware Water Gap National Recreation Area, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 610. |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 114-339. |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2016-02-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-02-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H886) |
2016-02-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3620. |
2016-02-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H886-887) |
2016-02-24 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 332. |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-435. |
2016-02-03 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-02-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-02-02 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2016-02-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-10-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-09-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-09-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
Subjects
Licensing and registrations
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pennsylvania
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
User charges and fees
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pennsylvania
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
User charges and fees