US HB3682 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Sec. 3) requires the Department of Agriculture (USDA) and the Department of the Interior to issue guidance related to certain community land grants in New Mexico made by Spain or Mexico to individuals, groups, and communities to promote the settlement of the southwestern United States (land grant-mercedes). The guidance shall set forth the policies and procedures for notice and comment on planning decisions, routine engagement, and major federal actions that could impact historical-traditional uses of a qualified land grant-merced. (Sec. 4) In developing, maintaining, and revising land management plans and National Forest System land and resource management plans, as applicable, the USDA or Interior shall consider and, as appropriate, provide for and evaluate impacts to historical-traditional uses by qualified land grant-mercedes. (Sec. 5) The USDA shall initiate negotiated rulemaking procedures to promulgate such regulations as are necessary to carry out and implement the Forest Service's Acequia Guidance Document, dated July 2, 2019.
Title
Land Grant-Mercedes Traditional Use Recognition and Consultation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2020-12-03 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6124-6125) |
2020-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3682. |
2020-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6124-6126) |
2020-12-03 | House | Mr. Case moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-11-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 495. |
2020-11-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-602. |
2020-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-07-29 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2020-07-29 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2020-06-18 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-07-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-07-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Archaeology and anthropology
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental regulatory procedures
Evidence and witnesses
Federal district courts
Government information and archives
Historical and cultural resources
Horticulture and plants
Hunting and fishing
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Motor vehicles
Navigation, waterways, harbors
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Religion
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Water storage
Water use and supply
Archaeology and anthropology
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental regulatory procedures
Evidence and witnesses
Federal district courts
Government information and archives
Historical and cultural resources
Horticulture and plants
Hunting and fishing
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Motor vehicles
Navigation, waterways, harbors
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Religion
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Water storage
Water use and supply